IL HB2977 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the classes of persons eligible for Medicaid.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Wages & Rates Subcommittee |
2019-03-22 | House | To Wages & Rates Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |