IL HB2977 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that every public elementary school and high school shall include in its curriculum a unit of instruction practicing writing in cursive.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CURSIVE WRITING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0548
2017-11-09HouseEffective Date July 1, 2018
2017-11-08HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2017-11-08SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 042-012-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-11-01SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto
2017-10-25HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 077-036-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-17HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-10-12HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2017-09-22HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 062-038-000
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseArrived in House
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-015-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
2017-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-001-001
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateDo Pass Education; 010-001-001
2017-05-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-23SenatePostponed - Education
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Education
2017-05-08SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-048-000
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-04-05HouseMotion Prevailed 061-052-000
2017-04-05HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-05HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-13HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-13HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-006-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-20.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2977&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2977.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2977eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2977enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2977gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0548.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2977sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2977_04052017_057000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2977_04262017_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2977_05302017_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2977_06252017_012000C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2977_10252017_018000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2977_11082017_009000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback