IL HB2974 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that members of the United States Service and members of United States Armed Forces and their spouses or dependents who are absent from the county may request ballots not less than 5 (rather than 10) days before the election if the ballot is to be mailed or less than one day prior to the date of the election if the ballot is to be sent electronically. Repeals provisions concerning certain special applications for votes by mail and special voter applications. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-MILITARY VOTING
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | To Ballot Access Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 20-13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 20-13.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 20-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 20-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2974&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2974.htm |