IL HB2965 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987. Provides that when a mortgagor is in arrears more than one month, no licensee shall refuse to accept any payments offered by the mortgagor in whole month payment amounts. Provides that such payments shall be applied to the unpaid balance in the manner provided in the licensee's mortgage with that mortgagor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MORTGAGE LOAN-ARREARS PAYMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0268
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-04-06SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056355-8.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback