IL HB2959 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no policy of individual or group accident and health insurance issued, amended, delivered, or renewed on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act may impose any preexisting condition exclusion with respect to that plan or coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-PREEXISTING CONDITION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 087-026-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-005-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateDo Pass Insurance; 011-006-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-18SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-28HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-033-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-29HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Consumer Protection Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-28HouseRe-assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.25New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback