IL HB2957 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Landscape Architecture Act of 1989. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-11-13Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris
2019-11-13SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
2019-11-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-11-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-10-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-10-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-10-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 30, 2019
2019-10-29SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-10-29SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-03-26HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-26HouseRe-assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-03-19HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2253155Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback