IL HB2953 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Regional Transportation Authority Board shall adopt regulations to ensure that the construction or acquisition by the Authority or a Service Board other than the Chicago Transit Authority of services or public transportation facilities (other than real estate) involving a cost of more than the small purchase threshold set by the Federal Transit Administration (rather than $40,000) shall be after public notice and with public bidding. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RTA ACT-BIDDING THRESHOLD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-29HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-29House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 089-021-000
2017-06-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 089-021-000
2017-06-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-06-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-06-26House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Lost 070-036-000
2017-06-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Lost 070-036-000
2017-06-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Mass Transit Committee; 007-001-000
2017-06-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Mass Transit Committee; 007-001-000
2017-06-22HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Mass Transit Committee
2017-06-22HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Mass Transit Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-31HouseArrived in House
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-006-000
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval
2017-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateDo Pass Transportation; 014-002-000
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-18SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-031-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mass Transit Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-02HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Mass Transit Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7036154.06Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2953&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2953.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2953eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2953enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2953ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2953sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2953sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2953_04282017_029000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2953_05312017_052000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2953_06262017_011001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2953_06262017_011000C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2953_06292017_013001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2953_06292017_013000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback