IL HB2952 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Cellular Telephone Customer Privacy Act. Provides that, with specified exceptions, a person may not sell or disclose or offer to sell or disclose any customer proprietary network information relating to the wireless telephone service account of any resident of this State. Provides that a person who knowingly violates this Act commits an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act, and amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act accordingly.
Title
CELL PHONE CUSTOMER PRIVACY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles W. Krezwick |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Telecommunications |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2952&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB2952.htm |