IL HB2950 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires each school, charter school, and non-public, non-sectarian elementary or secondary school to provide information on a quarterly basis to students concerning what to do if the student is being bullied and what resources are available. Requires each school to designate school personnel who are available for help with a bully or to make a report about bullying. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ANTI-BULLY RESOURCES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-16SenatePostponed - Education
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-010-000
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-23.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback