IL HB2943 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2019, the costs of the Environmental Protection Agency for the administration of the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Law of 2005 shall be paid, subject to appropriation, from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund into the Vehicle Inspection Fund. Provides that, beginning in 2019, no later than December 31 of each year, or as soon thereafter as practical, any balance remaining in the Vehicle Inspection Fund in excess of $2,000,000 shall be transferred from the Vehicle Inspection Fund to the Motor Fuel Tax Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL TAX-IEPA-EMISSIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0493 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-005-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-016-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Verified |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-002-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-003-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-021-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-21 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |