IL HB2943 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Secretary of State Merit Employment Code, the Comptroller Merit Employment Code, the State Treasurer Employment Code, and the Personnel Code. Provides that preferences shall be granted to qualified persons with disabilities in entrance examinations for employment positions under the separate Acts. Provides that the preference shall be in the form of points added to the final grades of the persons if they otherwise qualify and are entitled to appear on the list of those eligible for appointments.
Title
PERSONNEL CD-DISABILITY PREFER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 310 | 10b.7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 410 | 10b.7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 510 | 9b.5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 415 | 8b.7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2943&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB2943.htm |