IL HB2941 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Illinois Department of Corrections, the Cook County Department of Corrections, and the office of the sheriff of every other county to honor all intergovernmental agreements with the Department of Human Services concerning the exchange of inmate information and to provide all required information in a timely manner. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC AID-INMATE INFORMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0115
2019-07-22HouseEffective Date July 22, 2019
2019-07-22HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.7bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback