IL HB2940 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Raffles and Poker Runs Act. Provides that a county may, by a vote of two-thirds of the members of the governing board, pass an ordinance prohibiting a poker run key location from being located within the county's boundaries. Provides that a county that has prohibited poker runs is not required to establish a system for the licensing of organizations to operate poker runs. Provides that a license for a poker run authorizes the licensee to conduct the poker run at locations within the county with jurisdiction over the key location and at locations within any other county that licenses poker runs. Provides that a poker run conducted at locations in multiple counties is only required to be licensed by the county with jurisdiction over the key location. Removes provisions providing that the governing bodies of 2 or more adjacent counties may contract to jointly establish a licensing system for organizations to operate poker runs. Effective immediately.
Title
POKER RUNS-MULTIPLE COUNTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 15 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2940&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2940.htm |