IL HB2938 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that in order to post a speed limit on a highway under its jurisdiction that is less than the limit prescribed in a provision of the Code concerning general speed restrictions, the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority shall obtain approval from the General Assembly. Provides that the Authority shall not issue a regulation to change the speed limit for vehicles of the second division weighing more than 8,000 pounds that is more than 10 miles per hour less than the maximum speed limit of that highway. Provides that beginning 6 months after the effective date of the bill, and except for vehicles of the second division weighing more than 8,000 pounds, the Authority shall issue a regulation to change the speed limit on any part of a highway under its jurisdiction to the maximum speed limit authorized in the Code for highways under its jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-TOLL HGHWY-SPEED LIMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR)
2017-05-30SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-05-30SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-04-27SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-005-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Tollway Oversight Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tollway Oversight Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-603Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback