IL HB2937 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law in a Section concerning business processing reengineering and efficient government planning to provide that specified cost savings may (rather than shall) be paid into the General Revenue Fund (rather than the Efficiency Initiative Revolving Fund). Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law to repeal a Section concerning loans to qualified ex-offenders. Amends the Brownfields Redevelopment and Intermodal Promotion Act to correct references to the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Fund. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law to repeal Sections concerning various Funds and grants. Amends the State Finance Act to repeal various Funds and make conforming changes. Repeals the Transportation Development Partnership Act. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to repeal Sections concerning Fund checkoffs. Amends the Counties Code, the Illinois Public Aid Code, and the Clerks of Courts Act to remove language concerning moneys to be deposited in specified Funds. Makes other changes in statutes concerning the use or repeal of specified Funds. Provides a State mandate exemption. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-FUND CLEANUP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0275
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-21HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-21HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-06HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-352Repealed CodeCitation Text
2023102310-357Repealed CodeCitation Text
2023102310-359Repealed CodeCitation Text
2023102310-361Repealed CodeCitation Text
2023102310-399Repealed CodeCitation Text
2023102310-403Repealed CodeCitation Text
2023102310-612Repealed CodeCitation Text
203958ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-292Amended CodeCitation Text
20605605-416Repealed CodeCitation Text
206073-15Amended CodeCitation Text
206073-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2072035Repealed CodeCitation Text
205548Amended CodeCitation Text
251304-9Repealed CodeCitation Text
3010513.2Amended CodeCitation Text
3010525Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.231Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.290Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.298Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.460Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.518Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.606Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.614Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.615Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.622Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.633Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.639Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.641Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.647Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.649Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.658Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.660Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.687Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.701Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.722Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.738Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.794Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.803Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.807Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.95Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056p-5Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056uRepealed CodeCitation Text
301056zRepealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-1Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-27.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-33Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-46Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-69Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-73Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-8aRepealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-91Repealed CodeCitation Text
301058.16cRepealed CodeCitation Text
301058.32Repealed CodeCitation Text
30177ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
303403Amended CodeCitation Text
307805-55Repealed CodeCitation Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
30510ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
305512-10.10Amended CodeCitation Text
305512-5Amended CodeCitation Text
355507CCRepealed CodeCitation Text
355507HHRepealed CodeCitation Text
355507IIRepealed CodeCitation Text
355507KKRepealed CodeCitation Text
355507LLRepealed CodeCitation Text
355507PPRepealed CodeCitation Text
50535Art. IVRepealed CodeCitation Text
5553-4006.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
5553-9005Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1035.1Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3aAmended CodeCitation Text
73053-2-2.2Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback