IL HB2937 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Toll Highway Act. Deletes provisions concerning: land disclosure requirements; condemnation proceedings; beneficial interests; procedures for disclosure; recordation; validity of agreements; penalties; and other requirements. Provides that the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority may not enter into any contract relating to the ownership or use of real property unless the identity of every owner and beneficiary having an interest in the property and every member, shareholder, limited partner, or general partner entitled to receive more than 7.5% of the distributable income of any company or corporation having an interest in the property is disclosed. Provides that the disclosure shall be in writing and under oath. Provides that the beneficiaries of a lease shall furnish a trustee subject to disclosure under the provision with a letter of direction authorizing the trustee to provide the Authority with an up-to-date disclosure whenever requested by the Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOLL HGHWY-LAND DISCLOSURE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-022-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Tollway Oversight Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tollway Oversight Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
605109.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback