IL HB2936 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act and the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the Illinois State Police, by rule, shall provide that if a person has been issued a concealed carry license under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act, his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card and concealed carry license shall expire at the same time. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall adjust the expiration of each person who has been issued both a Firearm Owner's Identification Card and concealed carry license so each expires on the same date. Provides that a person who has been issued a Firearm Owner's Identification Card and whose concealed carry license has been renewed by the Illinois State Police shall receive an automatic renewal of his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card.
Title
FOID&CONCEALED CARRY-EXPIRE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2936&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2936.htm |