IL HB2936 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Jobs Creation Finance Act. Provides that municipalities may designate job creation areas. Provides that businesses that undertake job creation projects in those designated areas are eligible for certain tax incentives. Provides that municipalities may issue bonds in connection with those projects. Contains provisions concerning public hearings. Contains numerous other provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JOB CREATION-FINANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback