IL HB2935 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Includes in the definition of "item of contraband", a recording device and broadcast equipment. Defines "recording device" and "broadcast equipment". Includes in the definition of "penal institution" the airspace above the ground on which a penal institution is sited. Provides that possessing contraband that is a recording device, broadcast equipment, or electronic contraband in a penal institution, on penal institution property, or within the proximity of penal institution property with the intent to disrupt safety, security, or operations of the penal institution, is a Class 2 felony. Provides that a person commits unauthorized possession of contraband in a penal institution by an employee when a person who is an employee knowingly and without authority of any person designated or authorized to grant this authority delivers, possesses, conspires to deliver or solicits delivery, causes or permits delivery, or permits another to attempt to deliver, any item of contraband within the proximity of penal institution property with the intent to disrupt safety, security, or operations of the penal institution. Provides that placing or causing to be placed, or allowing another to place or cause to place a recording device, broadcast equipment, or electronic contraband on penal institution property or within the proximity of penal institution property with the intent to disrupt safety, security, or operations of the penal institution is a Class 2 felony. Provides that if the intent is to deliver the contraband to an inmate, it is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-CONTRABAND-PENAL INST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-03SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-001-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2017-03-28HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-15HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720531A-0.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720531A-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720531A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback