IL HB2933 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in the case of a deficiency judgment, if the owner of the property at the time of the tax sale can be located after a reasonably diligent search by the clerk of the court, then net income shall be returned to that person. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SURPLUS PROCEEDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2933&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2933.htm |