IL HB2933 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987 from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Reorganizes the Act by adding titles and renumbering provisions. Replaces references to "supervising physicians" with references to "collaborating physicians" throughout the Act. Replaces references to "supervision agreement" with references to "collaborative agreement" throughout the Act. Adds provisions concerning continuing education. In provisions concerning grounds for disciplinary action, provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may refuse to issue or renew a physician assistant license or discipline a licensee for willfully or negligently violating a patient's confidentiality, except as required by law, or failing to provide copies of medical records as required by law. Amends various Acts to conform references and terminology. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-002-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10514510Amended CodeCitation Text
105522-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2256054.5Amended CodeCitation Text
225854Amended CodeCitation Text
225951Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-25Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-50Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-55Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-60Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-65Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-70Amended CodeCitation Text
2259510-75New CodeSee Bill Text
2259510.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2259511Amended CodeCitation Text
2259512Amended CodeCitation Text
2259513Amended CodeCitation Text
2259514.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-100Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-25Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-50Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-55Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-60Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-65Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-70Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-75Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-80Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-85Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-90Amended CodeCitation Text
2259515-95Amended CodeCitation Text
2259516Amended CodeCitation Text
2259517Amended CodeCitation Text
2259519Amended CodeCitation Text
225952Amended CodeCitation Text
2259520Amended CodeCitation Text
2259521Amended CodeCitation Text
2259521.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.10Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.11Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.12Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.13Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.14Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.16Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.3Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.4Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.6Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.7Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.8Amended CodeCitation Text
2259522.9Amended CodeCitation Text
2259523Amended CodeCitation Text
2259524Amended CodeCitation Text
2259525Amended CodeCitation Text
225953Amended CodeCitation Text
225954Amended CodeCitation Text
225955Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-1Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-10Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-15Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-20Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-25Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-30Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-35New CodeSee Bill Text
225955-40New CodeSee Bill Text
225955-45Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-5Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-50Amended CodeCitation Text
225955-55Amended CodeCitation Text
225956Amended CodeCitation Text
225957Amended CodeCitation Text
225957.5Amended CodeCitation Text
225957.7Amended CodeCitation Text
225959Amended CodeCitation Text
225959.5Amended CodeCitation Text
22595Tit. 10 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
22595Tit. 15 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
22595Tit. 5 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
30555-8Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text
72051011Amended CodeCitation Text
720570102Amended CodeCitation Text
720570303.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback