IL HB2932 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Makes numerous changes in provisions concerning: common expenses; liens for nonpayment of common expenses; other liens; standing and capacity of the board of managers; disposition or removal of any portion of the property; the contents of bylaws; powers and duties of board of managers; master associations; display of the American flag or a military flag; standards for community association managers; and resale of a condominium unit.
Title
CONDOMINIUM ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 22.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2932&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2932.htm |