IL HB2931 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on July 3, 1996 by the Village of Phoenix. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-VILLAGE OF PHOENIX

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0274
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 103-009-000
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
2019-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 4
2019-05-24HouseArrived in House
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-002-000
2019-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Harris
2019-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-001-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-007-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-21HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-21HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-06HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2931&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2931.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2931eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2931enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0274.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2931sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2931sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2931sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2931sam004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2931_03292019_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2931_05242019_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2931sam004_05302019_024000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback