IL HB2929 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections to create a form to be used by an election authority to remove a voter from its roll. Provides that the county clerk of the county where a decedent last resided shall (rather than may) issue certifications of death records from an electronic reporting system for death registrations as provided in the Vital Records Act and shall (rather than may) use that system to cancel the registration of any person who died during the preceding month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-DECEASED VOTERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Ethics & Elections
2023-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Ethics & Elections
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051A-70New CodeSee Bill Text
1054-14.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-9.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback