IL HB2929 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Prohibits a political committee from making certain expenditures to provide a defense in any criminal case or a defense in a civil case pertaining to misconduct by a person in his or her capacity as a public official, sexual harassment claims, or discrimination claims. Requires that a person found to have used campaign contributions in violation of the Code shall return contributions to the contributor or pay to the State if the contributor cannot be identified or reimbursed. Requires the political committee to include information on the contributions returned to the contributor or paid to the State in the committee's quarterly report to the State Board of Elections.
Title
ELEC CD-USE OF FUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | To Procurement Subcommitee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9-8.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2929&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2929.htm |