IL HB2926 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Creates the Public Utility Infrastructure Hardening and Protection Law as a new Article in the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall present to the General Assembly, no later than December 31, 2023, an identification of critical infrastructure that is essential to provide public utility services to the people of Illinois and related information.
Title
UTIL-INFRASTRUCTURE HARDENING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 23-100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 23-101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 23-105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | Art. XXIII headi | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2926&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2926.htm |