IL HB2926 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Governmental and Governmental Employees Tort Immunity Act. Adds to the Article concerning medical, hospital, and public health activities a definition of "service agency under contract with a public entity" to mean an entity under contract with a local public entity to provide emergency and sick call medical services to inmates of a county jail. Adds "a service agency under contract with a public entity" to provisions granting immunity to a local public entity or a public employee concerning medical care.
Title
IMMUNITY-MEDICAL SERVCE AGENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
745 | 10 | 6-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 10 | 6-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 10 | 6-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 10 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 10 | 6-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 10 | 6-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 10 | 6-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2926&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB2926.htm |