IL HB2907 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-13)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-13)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning access to psychiatric mental health services via telepsychiatry, provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not require that a physician or other licensed health care professional be physically present in the same room as the patient for the entire time during which the patient is receiving telepsychiatry services. Provides that the Department shall not require that a physician or other licensed healthcare professional be physically present in the same room as the patient for the entire time during which the patient is receiving telemedicine services. Defines "telemedicine" as the use of a telecommunication system to provide medical services for the purpose of evaluation and treatment when the patient is at one location and the rendering provider is at another location.
Title
DHFS-TELEMEDICINE-REQUIRMNTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0385 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.25a | New Code | See Bill Text |