IL HB2899 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Coal Mining Act. Provides that a mine operator must provide the number of self-contained self-rescuer devices as required by the mine's approved Mine Safety and Health Administration Emergency Response Plan. Removes language concerning plan requirements submitted for approval to the Mining Board. Provides that rescue chambers must be provided and located within 1,000 (rather than 3,000) feet from the nearest working face of each working section of a mine. Provides that outby rescue chambers must be provided at distances and locations approved in the mine's approved Mine Safety and Health Administration Emergency Response Plan. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COAL MINING-SELF RESCUERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 020-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22570511.08Amended CodeCitation Text
22570511.09Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback