IL HB2898 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Removes the date (of June 30, 2021) until which a principal endorsement may be affixed to the Professional Educator License of a person who has, among other qualifications, at least 4 total years of experience working in the capacity of school support personnel. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PRINCIPAL ENDORSEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0267
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date August 22, 2017
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-001-000
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback