IL HB2894 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act. Provides that the Auditor General shall cause an audit to be made of the Program on or before June 30, 2022 and every 3 years thereafter (rather than annually). Repeals provisions providing for repeal of the Act on October 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
COVERING ALL KIDS INSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0272 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 018-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-045-000 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 170 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 170 | 98 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |