IL HB2892 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that no medical provider shall be reimbursed for a supply of prescriptions filled outside of a licensed pharmacy except when there exists no licensed pharmacy within 5 miles of the prescribing physician's practice. Provides that, if there exists no licensed pharmacy within 5 miles of the prescribing physician's practice, no medical provider shall be reimbursed for a prescription, the supply of which lasts for longer than 72 hours from the date of injury or 24 hours from the date of first referral to the medical service provider, whichever is greater, filled and dispensed outside of a licensed pharmacy. Provides that the limitations on filling and dispensing prescriptions do not apply if there exists a pre-arranged agreement between the medical provider and a preferred provider program regarding the filling of prescriptions outside a licensed pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKER COMP-FILL PRESCRIPTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseTo Workers Compensation Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203058.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback