IL HB2891 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Defines "dismemberment abortion". Provides that no person shall perform, or attempt to perform, a dismemberment abortion on an unborn child unless: (1) the dismemberment abortion is necessary to preserve the life of the pregnant woman; or (2) a continuation of the pregnancy will cause a substantial and irreversible physical impairment of a major bodily function of the pregnant woman. Provides that no woman upon whom an abortion is performed or attempted to be performed shall be criminally or civilly liable for performing or attempting to perform a dismemberment abortion. Provides that no nurse, technician, secretary, receptionist, or other employee or agent who is not a physician, but who acts at the direction of a physician, and no pharmacist or other individual who is not a physician, but who fills a prescription or provides instruments or materials used in an abortion at the direction of or to a physician shall be criminally or civilly liable for performing or attempting to perform a dismemberment abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABORTION LAW-DISMEMBERMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseTo Informed Consent Subcommitee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7205102Amended CodeCitation Text
7205103.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback