IL HB2887 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Public Health for implementing the Equity and Representation in Health Care Act. Effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DPH-EQUITY AND REP-HLTH CARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-26HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback