IL HB2882 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes do not apply to or affect any person carrying a concealed pistol, revolver, or handgun and the person has been issued a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card under the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 305 | 13.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-595 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a in part | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 10-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2882&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2882.htm |