IL HB2880 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that no later than 6 months after the effective date, the Environmental Protection Agency shall propose to the Board, and, no later than one year after the Board's receipt of the Agency's proposal, the Board shall adopt rules allowing for the subdivision of areas within a permitted clean construction or demolition debris site for specified purposes. Contains provisions concerning requirements for the rules. Provides that until the effective date of the rules adopted following the Agency's proposal, the Agency may grant permit modifications for closure of a subdivided area within a permitted clean construction and demolition debris fill operation upon application by the clean construction and demolition debris fill operator as long as any permit modification so granted by the Agency is protective of human health and the environment. Provides that the Agency shall consult with members of the mining, construction, and real estate development industry during the development of any rules to promote the purpose of specified provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSTRUCTION-DEMOLITION DEBRIS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-002-000
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-002-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 012-002-000
2017-03-21HouseRemains in Environment
2017-03-21HouseMotion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Environment; 010-003-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415522.51Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback