IL HB2878 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that an action for a violation of the Act shall be commenced by the State Commission within 2 years after the date of the violation. Provides that any notice issued by the State Commission to a licensee for a violation of the Act or any notice with respect to a settlement or offer in compromise shall include the field report, photographs, and any other supporting documentation necessary to reasonably inform the licensee of the nature and extent of the violation or the conduct alleged to have occurred. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-VIOLATIONS OF ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0134 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-017-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |