IL HB2877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Allows for video gaming by organization licensees and inter-track wagering location licensees under the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975; makes conforming changes throughout the Video Gaming Act and in the Criminal Code of 2012. Removes references to organization licensees and inter-track wagering location licensees from the definition of "licensed establishment". Provides that an organization licensee who held that license in 2016 may operate up to 150 video gaming terminals on its premises at any time and an inter-track wagering location licensee may operate up to 5 video gaming terminals at the inter-track wagering location licensee's location or on the premises of the organization licensee with which they are affiliated. Requires organization licensees and inter-track wagering location licensees to deposit 47% of their share of the net terminal income from video gaming into the horsemen purse accounts associated with their respective racetrack to be distributed by agreements between breeds unless the organization licensee and the horsemen associations representing the largest number of owners, trainers, jockeys, or standardbred drivers who race horses at that organization licensee's racing meetings agree to allocate expenses associated with the video gaming terminals. Makes other changes.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-TRACKS/OTB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-002-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported Back To Executive Committee; |
2017-05-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Executive Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-05-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-08 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 28-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |