IL HB2871 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, when calculating the taxpayer's base income, the taxpayer's federal adjusted gross income shall be modified to exclude the portion of the income or loss received from a trade or business conducted within and without Illinois or from a pass-through entity conducting business within and without Illinois that is not derived from or connected with Illinois sources. Repeals provisions concerning a credit for foreign taxes. Effective immediately.
Title
INCOME TAX-PASS THROUGH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-01-28 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-01-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |