IL HB2866 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides for a homestead exemption in the amount of $5,000 for property that is owned and occupied as the principal residence of an active duty member of the military. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Sen. Diane Pappas [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2866&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2866.htm |