IL HB2858 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Peace Officer Accountability Act. Provides that before a peace officer is permitted to carry a firearm in the unit of government in which he or she is employed, the peace officer must either: (1) live in the unit of government in which he or she serves; or (2) complete 200 hours of specified work or training. Provides that the unit of government shall require each peace officer employed by the unit of government before entering upon the officer's duties to have a liability insurance policy. Provides that the public shall have access to all documents concerning promotions, which documents are subject to disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that each peace officer, before discharging his or her duties as a peace officer, shall sign an affidavit declaring that he or she will report all unethical and unlawful conduct of other peace officers immediately to the internal affairs division of the department. Provides that the exclusive representative of a peace officer bargaining unit may not enter into a contract or collective bargaining agreement with the department that permits unconstitutional conduct by peace officers. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the minimum standards for police academies shall include 20 hours of race relations training, acquaintance with the youth residing in the unit of government in which the officers will serve, when discharging a firearm, the avoidance of the use of deadly force except when necessary to protect the life of the officer and on methods of using less than deadly force to disarm a suspect. Provides annual 20 hours of training of peace officers in race relations and constitutional methods of the use of force. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEACE OFFICER ACCOUNTABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
53154Amended CodeCitation Text
507057Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback