IL HB2856 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Boxing and Full-contact Martial Arts Act. Changes the definition of "amateur" to allow the person to receive a stipend for an athletic club or sponsor of the contestant to cover the cost of training and participation expenses not to exceed $1,500. Provides that "full-contact martial arts" includes, but is not limited to, mixed martial arts and kickboxing techniques. Defines "incumbent sanctioning body". Exempts the following from oversight by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation: (1) amateur boxing or full-contact martial arts contests that occur in facilities owned, operated, or managed by a State, county, or local public entity and are conducted by a sanctioning body and (2) amateur boxing, martial arts, or full-contact martial arts contests that are sponsored by a not-for-profit organization and conducted by a sanctioning body. Requires the sponsor of a qualified contest exempt from Department oversight to notify the Department of its intent to sponsor events. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BOXING/MARTIAL ARTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-08HouseTo Business Licenses Subcommittee
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2251051Amended CodeCitation Text
2251056Amended CodeCitation Text
2251058.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback