IL HB2856 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Safety Agency Network Act. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings that 9-1-1 call centers are not able to transfer a call made by an individual in an area served by one 9-1-1 call center on behalf of another individual experiencing an emergency in an area served by a different 9-1-1 call center. Requires the Board of the Illinois Public Safety Agency Network to analyze and recommend legislation regarding the implementation of a 9-1-1 call forwarding or transfer feature and the establishment of a navigable directory of all local police departments, fire departments, rescue groups, and other emergency assistance departments for every county through this State. Provides that by December 31, 2014, the Board shall present its report to the General Assembly. Repeals the provisions of the amendatory Act on December 31, 2015. Effective January 1, 2014.
Title
EMERGENCY CALL FORWARDING
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0332 |
2013-08-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 016-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 021-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |