IL HB2854 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Fire Protection District Act. Creates a hiring preference of up to 20 points for a person who has performed fire suppression service for a department as a firefighter apprentice and otherwise meet the qualifications for original appointment as a firefighter. Requires the firefighter to have completed a minimum of 600 hours of specified fire suppression work in order to be considered for the preference and that the Joint Apprenticeship Committee shall evaluate the merit of the applicant's performance and determine the preference points to be awarded. Modifies how preferences are computed after addition of the apprentice preference. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRE DPT-APPRENTICE PREFERENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0489
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-19HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65510-1-7.1Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-2.1-6.3Amended CodeCitation Text
7070516.06bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2854&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2854.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2854eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2854enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0489.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2854ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2854sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2854_03292019_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2854_05212019_073000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2854sam001_05302019_021000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback