IL HB2854 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department to establish a lifelong learning program to allow employees, with the support of their employers, to create educational savings accounts that may be used to fund approved education and training.
Title
DCEO-LIFELONG LEARNING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-003-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2854&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2854.htm |