IL HB2853 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Makes changes concerning the time and circumstances under which financial organization deposits are presumed abandoned. Provides that compensation held on a payroll card is reportable one year after the date of the last indication of interest in the property by the apparent owner, except if the payroll card becomes a demand deposit, then 3 years after the date of the last indication of interest in the property by the apparent owner. Provides that the administrator does not need to notify the Department of Revenue of the names or social security numbers of apparent owners of abandoned property if he or she reasonably believes that the Department of Revenue will be unable to provide information that would provide sufficient evidence to establish that the person in the Department of Revenue's records is the apparent owner of unclaimed property in the custody of the administrator. Provides that the State Treasurer shall examine a financial organization in compliance with the visitation standards established in the National Bank Act or the Federal Credit Union Act, if applicable. Provides that records obtained in examinations of State-regulated financial organizations are subject to the same provisions concerning use and confidentiality as records obtained in examinations of other persons. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 1026 | 15-1002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-1002.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-1004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-1401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-1402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2853&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2853.htm |