IL HB2847 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Organ Donor Leave Act. Provides that an employer shall not retaliate against an employee for requesting or obtaining a leave of absence to donate blood, an organ, or bone marrow. Amends the Illinois Insurance Act. Provides prohibitions on denial of coverage and costs of premiums for living organ donors for life insurance, disability insurance, and long-term care insurance policies. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Requires the Secretary of State to review and update certain public service announcements, websites, and other media relating to live organ donation to educate the public on the benefits of live organ donation and the impact of live organ donation on access to insurance. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ORGAN DONOR PROTECTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0179
2019-08-01HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-01HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Insurance; 015-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 021-000-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-12HouseReported Back To Insurance Committee;
2019-03-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-28HouseTo Special Subcommittee (INS)
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155155.46New CodeSee Bill Text
532720Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-117Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback