IL HB2843 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that the term "official" as used under the Act includes specified officials of a unit of local government. Modifies the terms "lobby" and "lobbying" to include communications with units of local government for the ultimate purpose of influencing any executive, legislative, or administrative action, and further specifies such actions. Modifies the term "lobbyist" to mean a natural person who, on behalf of any person other than himself or herself, or as any part of his or her duties as an employee of another, undertakes to influence or lobby for any executive, legislative, or administrative action for State government or a unit of local government. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act to provide that no legislator may engage in lobbying as that term is defined under the Lobbyist Registration Act (currently, as defined under the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act) for compensation.
Title
GOV ETHICS-LOCAL GOVT LOBBYING
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 170 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2843&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2843.htm |