IL HB2843 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Eliminates convictions of prostitution and felony prostitution under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance from a provision permitting a motion to vacate the conviction. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-MOTION TO VACATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255116-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback