IL HB2843 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975, the Riverboat Gambling Act, and the Income Withholding for Support Act. Provides that an organization licensee under the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 shall withhold moneys from winning wagers and winnings from wagers placed upon races conducted by that organization licensee as provided in the Income Withholding for Support Act; imposes a similar duty on a licensed owner under the Riverboat Gambling Act with respect to winnings on games. Provides that if a licensed owner fails to withhold, from winnings otherwise payable to an individual, an amount representing delinquent child support as required under the Income Withholding for Support Act, the owner's license is not renewable upon its expiration, but the owner must instead apply for a new license. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide to each organization licensee under the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 and each licensed owner under the Riverboat Gambling Act information concerning all individuals who are identified in the State Case Registry of child support orders and who have been determined to be delinquent in child support. Provides for: the obligations of an organization licensee or licensed owner; notice to the obligor; priority of claims; administrative appeals; enforcement; and immunity.
Title
INCOME W/HOLDG-GAMING WINNINGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0318 |
2013-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2013 |
2013-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2013-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 13.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 5 | 27.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
750 | 28 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text |